U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 20, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 16, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • May 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.