U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 09, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.