U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COOK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 15, 2021: [Telephonic Notice]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 13, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 11, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 25, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 24, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 21, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.