U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHRISTIAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 21, 2021: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 09, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 27, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.