U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLEMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Declaration]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.