U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRAZIER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • August 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 13, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.