U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • May 06, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment 2255]
  • December 09, 2022: [SEALED Document]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • November 17, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 23, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 22, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 09, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • April 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.