U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAVARES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 19, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.