U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [SEALED Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Probation Petition/Order-Summons]
  • March 27, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • March 02, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • February 18, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 09, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • February 09, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 04, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 02, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • December 30, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 29, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 29, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
  • November 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Modifying Probation or Supervised Release]
  • October 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 29, 2021: [Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 03, 2021: [Telephonic Notice]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 02, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 27, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • August 26, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • August 26, 2021: [Seal ]
  • August 26, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Status Report ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 23, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 20, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 12, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 16, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 15, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • June 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 11, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 11, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 10, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.