U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 21, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.