U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MISENHEIMER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 05, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Continuing Trial Date]
  • June 21, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 21, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.