U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAROSSO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.