U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAULDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Suppress]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.