U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LILLARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 15, 2021: [Expedite]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 12, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 12, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • October 06, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 03, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • July 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.