U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEIDEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appeal Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 14, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
  • August 24, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.