U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOCKLEAR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 24, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2021: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • October 19, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • October 08, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 23, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 09, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.