U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WYNN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [SEALED Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment 2255]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 18, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arrest]
  • August 03, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 08, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 07, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 02, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 01, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • November 11, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 13, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.