U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COMMANDER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 13, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.