U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [SEALED Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • June 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.