U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DONOVAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • September 01, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • August 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 05, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 11, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • February 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • September 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proceed IFP]
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Video Conference Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
  • August 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 11, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.