U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • July 19, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.