U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RILEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 05, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 21, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 07, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.