U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COMPTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Mail Returned]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 12, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 05, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 09, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Affidavit]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • July 26, 2021: [SEALED Brief]
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion for Order]
  • July 24, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • July 19, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • July 19, 2021: [Suppress]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 22, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.