U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPINKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • October 10, 2024: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 23, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • February 23, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
January, 2022
  • January 15, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.