U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KAHELE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 17, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 16, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 25, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Suppress]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.