U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [USMS Return of Service]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 14, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Service by Publication]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • July 27, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 27, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 27, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • July 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 28, 2021: [Bond]
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 25, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.