U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boswell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arrest]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.