U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHEEK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 22, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 08, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Remand Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 03, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • December 01, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 16, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.