U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEHART
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • December 28, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • November 17, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 15, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 24, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.