U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shipman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • November 04, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • July 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Expedite]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 04, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • June 04, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 04, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 04, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.