U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasco-Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • October 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Suggestion of Subsequent Authority]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 24, 2021: [Reply to Response ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 01, 2021: [Dismiss ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • June 30, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 07, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 04, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Bond ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • May 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.