U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pierce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 22, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • May 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.