U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felix-Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 02, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.