U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00504-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 06, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 07, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice-other]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.