U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • June 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • May 24, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 27, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.