U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pendenque-Alcindor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice-other]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • April 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 14, 2022: [Vacate ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.