U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 06, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Amended Pretrial Services Report ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.