U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • July 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 21, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Protective Order ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.