U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sherman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Seal ]
  • October 18, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 07, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.