U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.