U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Royal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • September 27, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • September 27, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.