U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paguada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 11, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Sealed U.S. Probation Memorandum]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 02, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 28, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.