U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 19, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • January 17, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • January 10, 2023: [Appoint Counsel ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.