U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.