U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 04, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 04, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 22, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.