U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. England
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 27, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice-other]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • June 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.