U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramage
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 01, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 01, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Document]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.