U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00217-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Camarda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice-other]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 06, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 28, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.