U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:98-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLYBURN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • March 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • March 01, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • June 01, 2021: [Case Referred to Judge]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.