U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue Other]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • May 28, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.